English

# Easy Multiplication of Two Digit and Three Digit Numbers

Vedic mathematics makes it feasible to augment any two numerals in a short span of time. Learn from existing tips, tricks and multiply two numbers just by doing mind calculation.

## Multiplication of 2 and 3 Digit Numbers - Vedic Maths Tips and Tricks

#### Condition

:

Select any two numbers and deduct the rightmost digits, i.e., 'unit digit' from both the numerals. The results derived after subtraction of the numbers from unit digits should be 'Equal'. Vedic maths multiplication concept is applicable for all the digits.

#### Step 1:

Let us consider multiplying any two digit numbers, for example 23 x 24.

#### Step 2:

Choose the unit digit of both the numerals and deduct it from the given numerals.

23 - 3 = 20

24 - 4 = 20

#### Step 3:

Now, select any one number (24) and add it with unit digit of another number(3)

24 + 3 = 27

#### Step 4:

Then, multiply the result obtained in step 2 and step 3.

27 x 20 = 540

#### Step 5:

Multiply the unit digit values.

4 * 3 = 12

#### Step 6:

Finally, add values obtained from step 3 and step 4.

540 + 12 = 552

23 x 24 = 552

#### Step 1:

Let us consider multiplication of three digit numbers 208 x 206.

#### Step 2:

Now, deduct the last digit from the respective numerals.

208 - 8 = 200

206 - 6 = 200

#### Step 3:

Pick any one number and add it with the unit digit of another number.

208 + 6 = 214

#### Step 4:

Now, multiply the result obtained in step 1 and step 2.

214 * 200 = 42800

#### Step 5:

Then, multiply the unit digits of the given numbers.

8 * 6 = 48

#### Step 6:

Add the values obtained in step 4 and step 5.

42800 + 48 = 42848

208 x 206 = 42848

Vedic mathematics makes it feasible to augment any two numerals in a short span of time. Learn from existing tips, tricks and multiply two numbers just by doing mind calculation.