- Home
- Tags
- Random Facts
- Latest Facts

This trick can be applied when

- First digit of both the numbers (multiplicand and multiplier) are same.

- Sum of their second digits equals 10.

Example: **23 x 27**

In the above example, as first digit of both the numbers are 2 and sum on second digits (3+7) is 10 we can use this trick.

Follow the simple steps to learn the shortcut trick

**Step 1:** Take the first digit, add it with one and multiply the resultant value with the same.

= (2+1) x 2 = 6

**Step 2:** Multiply the second digits of both the numbers.

= 3x7 = 21

**Step 3:** Now join and write the step 1 and step 2 result together. That is the answer. So 23 x 27 = 621

With few more examples,

**Example 1: 92 x 98**

(9 + 1) x 9 = 90

2 x 8 = 16

Answer is **92 x 98 = 9016**

**Example 2: 77 x 73**

(7 + 1) x 7 = 56

7 x 3 = 21

Answer is **77 x 73 = 5621**

**Example 3: 85 x 85**

(8 + 1) x 8 = 72

5 x 5 = 25

Answer is **85 x 85 = 7225**

We would often think that there are more number of natural numbers than the even numbers because nat...

If this is proved to be correct, everything we have learned in our life so far in Mathematics will g...

This will be one of the world most unexplained phenomena you would ever see. The miracle of numbers ...

Percy Spencer, an American Engineer accidentally discovered Microwave Oven while working on Raytheon...

The number of possibility chess moves after the white move's is 20 (ie 4 knight moves and 16 moves o...

A Beautiful Mind is the movie based on the life of john nash, who is said to be Nobel Laureate in e...

Your twin sibling will get more youthful than you when he returns from the space travel. If your twi...

Grigori Yakovlevich Perelman is a Russian mathematician, who made a history in Riemannian geometry a...

Daily Maths Topic Today - Multiplication Shortcut for 2 Digit Numbers.